WY SF0113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the sale of alcoholic liquors; authorizing purchases from retail liquor licensees for resale as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Retail purchases of alcoholic liquors for resale.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-10-4-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-10-4-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 72 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0038 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0038 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0038 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0038 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-0-0-1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 46-10-4-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-0-0-1 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |