WY SF0113 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - 3rd Reading:Failed 19-40-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - 3rd Reading:Failed 19-40-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; authorizing municipalities to create community development districts as specified; specifying requirements; providing definitions; specifying duties and powers of community development districts and district boards of directors; authorizing assessments; specifying duties of municipalities; amending definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community development districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 19-40-1-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 19-40-1-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 28-1-1-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |