WY SF0112 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state institutions; amending provisions providing for the establishment of the Wyoming retirement center and the Wyoming pioneer home; providing state facilities background; requiring a determination by the department of health; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement center and pioneer home.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
2018-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-19SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0
2018-02-15SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback