WY SF0111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 43-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 199
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to postsecondary education; amending authorized academic programs at the community colleges; providing for community college commission approval of the baccalaureate degree programs; conforming Hathaway scholarship statutes; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community colleges-bachelor of applied science programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 199 | |
2019-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0080 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0080 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0080 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0080 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Concur:Passed 24-2-4-0-0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-25 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |