WY SF0111 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Chapter No. 45 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to property taxation; exempting virtual currencies from property taxation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation-digital currencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12 Chapter No. 45 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
2018-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0034
2018-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number 45
2018-03-08HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0034
2018-03-07SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0034
2018-03-07 Assigned Number SEA No. 0034
2018-03-07House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2018-03-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-05HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-02HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-02HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2018-02-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2018-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-21SenateS12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-20Senate:Rerefer to S12 - Rules
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue 26-3-1-0-0
2018-02-15SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback