WY SF0110 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; requiring the state board of control upon request to make a preliminary determination related to the unlawful use of water and to seek prosecution of violations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unlawful use of water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Digest/SF0110.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Introduced/SF0110.pdf |
Supplement | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Fiscal/SF0110.pdf |