WY SF0108 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to civil procedure; codifying an exemption from civil liability for public utilities as specified; specifying applicability of the Wyoming Governmental Claims Act; specifying legislative intent; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities-liability exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-02-12HouseH01 - Judiciary:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback