WY SF0103 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; establishing the educational program commission; establishing commission duties; directing the department of education to staff the commission; requiring reports; providing for initial staggered terms; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Educational program commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Curt Meier [R] | Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] | Sen. John Hastert [D] | Rep. James Byrd [D] |
Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Carl Loucks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 20-9-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2018-02-23 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 20-9-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |