WY SF0102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to circuit courts; amending requirements for the management of bank accounts for money received by the circuit court; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Circuit court bank accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 107
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0056
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0056
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0056
2019-02-21 Assigned Number SEA No. 0056
2019-02-21House3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-02-07HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2019-01-28Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-25SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-25SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback