WY SF0101 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 98 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; authorizing the department of health to establish fees for laboratory testing services as specified; specifying the use of the fees collected; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health laboratory fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 98 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0047
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0047
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0047
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0047
2016-03-02SenateConcur:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2016-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-16SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-16 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback