WY SF0101 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Chapter No. 147 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; amending provisions for resident tuition for military veterans, their spouses and children as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-10 Chapter No. 147 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-10 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-10 Governor Signed SEA No. 0046
2015-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0046
2015-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0046
2015-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0046
2015-02-27House3rd Reading:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
2015-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-19HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-19 Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2015-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-01-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-26SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-26 Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-22SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-01-21SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-20 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback