WY SF0099 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to children; providing for continuation of a guardian ad litem program administered by the state public defender's office; statutorily establishing and making modifications to the program; requiring appointment of the program for guardian ad litem cases as specified; providing for county participation and reimbursement; providing for liability of nonparticipating counties for guardian ad litem costs as specified; providing for coverage of attorneys providing guardian ad litem program services under the Wyoming Governmental Claims Act and state self-insurance program; authorizing payments for guardian ad litem services as specified; authorizing rulemaking; specifying standards for the program and participants; making conforming amendments; providing for funding; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardian ad litem program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-06 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-14 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-13 Governor Signed SEA0040
2012-03-07 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0040
2012-03-07 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0040
2012-03-06 Assigned Number SEA0040
2012-03-06 (S) Did Concur
2012-03-06 (S) Received for Concurrence
2012-03-06 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-05 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-02 (H) Passed CoW
2012-03-02 Amendment Adopted
2012-03-02 (H) Amendments Adopted
2012-03-01 (H) Placed on General File
2012-03-01 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-28 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2012-02-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-22 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (S01) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-17 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2012-02-15 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback