WY SF0098 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public funds; amending the threshold for determining the amount of funds in the permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund reserve account annually transferred to the permanent Wyoming mineral trust fund; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PWMTF reserve account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12Senatepostponed indefinitely
2020-03-12SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-06House3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0
2020-03-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-04HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-28HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-28HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-17SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-14SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback