WY SF0097 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to welfare; requiring Medicaid recipients to comply with specified work or volunteer requirements as a condition of continuing eligibility; providing exceptions; requiring the department of health to apply for a federal waiver relating to these requirements; prohibiting specified actions relating to the supplemental nutrition assistance program; specifying federal waiver requirements relating to child care and Medicaid; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid and SNAP-eligibility requirements-2.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Ray Peterson [R] | Sen. Charles Scott [R] |
Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] |
Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2018-03-06 | House | H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2018-03-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 28-1-1-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |