WY SF0097 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 100 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; modifying the duties of the attorney general's office to include administration of a call center and delivery of information to coordinate activities related to school and student safety; establishing a process for the release of confidential information; requiring reversion of and transferring school foundation program funds; allowing the transfer of federal funds; allowing for the transfer of personnel as specified; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student and school safety call center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 100 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0051
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0051
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0051
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0051
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2016-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2016-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 26-4-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback