WY SF0095 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Chapter No. 139 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-06 - Chapter No. 139 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to operation of motor vehicles; authorizing establishment of a higher speed limit on state highways as specified; amending penalties for violations of speed limits on interstate highways; authorizing a study; requiring a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Speed limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | Chapter No. 139 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0057 | |
2015-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0057 | |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-20 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2015-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-03 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |