WY SF0094 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to court ordered placement of children; clarifying allowable education costs reimbursed by the state for placements in authorized facilities; and providing for an effective date.
Title
BOCES-court ordered placement costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H04 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA0052 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2012-03-07 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0052 | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA0052 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (H04) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |