WY SF0092 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing the department of transportation to renew or defer the expiration of a driver's license for a person whose public employment requires physical presence outside of Wyoming or a person on active duty in the armed forces; extending the authorization to the person's spouse or dependent; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Driver's license renewal or extension-exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 72 | |
2022-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0043 | |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2022-03-10 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0043 | |
2022-03-10 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2022-03-09 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-08 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-03-03 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2022-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 24-6-0-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |