WY SF0091 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 101 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state institutions; creating a task force to review potential penitentiary construction needs; providing for membership, requirements for task force study and report; providing for staffing and for assistance by state agencies; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State penal facilities review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - COW:Failed 28-30-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 101 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0054
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0054
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0054
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0054
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-18 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback