WY SF0088 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; authorizing that the interest in certain state lands be sold to the United States Department of the Interior; authorizing an exchange of state lands for federal lands; authorizing a lease of state lands; providing terms for the sale or exchange; specifying termination of the authorization; continuing the state land exchange advisory panel; repealing previous authorizations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands within Grand Teton National Park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2016-03-04SenateAdopt JCC #1
2016-03-03HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-03SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Failed 0-29-1-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 42-15-3-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
2016-02-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2016-02-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12 - Rules 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback