WY SF0087 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professional licensing; adopting the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact; providing for participation in and administration of the compact; authorizing the interstate practice of audiology and speech-language pathology pursuant to the compact; providing for fingerprinting and background checks of license applicants and license renewals; providing conforming amendments; repealing a related provision; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audiology and speech-language pathology compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 25-1-4-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Assigned Chapter Number 128
2020-03-24 Governor Signed SEA No. 0059
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0059
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0059
2020-03-11 Assigned Number SEA No. 0059
2020-03-11SenateConcur:Passed 25-1-4-0-0
2020-03-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-11House3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0
2020-03-10House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-09HouseCOW:Passed
2020-03-02HousePlaced on General File
2020-03-02HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2020-02-26HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-26Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2020-02-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-17SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 21-8-1-0-0
2020-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-06 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback