WY SF0082 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the emergency expenses of government; amending a prior appropriation for water and sewer projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Eligible water and sewer projects funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-17 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-6-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |