WY SF0081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the regulation of traffic on highways; defining and regulating electric bicycles; establishing classes of electric bicycles; requiring a label on an electric bicycle; specifying applicability; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric bicycles-regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Passed 19-10-1-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 95
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0045
2019-02-21HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0045
2019-02-20SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0045
2019-02-20 Assigned Number SEA No. 0045
2019-02-20SenateConcur:Passed 19-10-1-0-0
2019-02-20SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 37-21-2-0-0
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2019-01-25Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-24SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-24SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-24SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback