WY SF0079 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Assigned Chapter Number 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; authorizing school districts to bill for school based services for Medicaid eligible students as specified; providing reimbursement to school districts for administrative costs; providing appropriations; authorizing a position; requiring reports; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Medicaid billing for school-based services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Assigned Chapter Number 60 | |
2021-04-01 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0020 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0020 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0020 |
2021-03-29 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0020 | |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2021-03-05 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2021-03-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-01 | Bill Number Assigned |