WY SF0077 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of government; modifying the public finance website to provide a process for lodging concerns regarding competition by government entities with the private sector; providing definitions; making conforming amendments; amending reporting requirement; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expenditure of public funds and government competition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H03 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S07 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2012-03-15 Governor Signed SEA0047
2012-03-07 (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0047
2012-03-07 (S) President Signed SEA No. 0047
2012-03-07 Assigned Number SEA0047
2012-03-07 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-05 (H) Passed CoW
2012-03-02 (H) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (H03) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-29 (H) Rereferred to H03
2012-02-28 (H) Introduced and Referred to H07
2012-02-28 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-21 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-21 (S07) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-15 (S) Introduced and Referred to S07
2012-02-14 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback