WY SF0076 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; providing that the legislature retains authority to determine beneficial use of water; providing a definition of "beneficial use"; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water-beneficial use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | (S) Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 7-3(c) | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff; Intro Vote | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0076.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Introduced/SF0076.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2012/Digest/SF0076.htm |