WY SF0075 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the courts; permitting courts to enter stipulated protective orders as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protective orders-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - Did Not Adopt SF0075JC001: 29-25-6-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0075JC001: 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07Senatepostponed indefinitely
2021-04-02HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-02SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2021-04-01SenateConcur:Failed 0-30-0-0-0
2021-04-01SenateReceived for Concurrence
2021-04-01House3rd Reading:Passed 41-19-0-0-0
2021-03-31House2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-30HouseCOW:Passed
2021-03-26HousePlaced on General File
2021-03-26HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2021-03-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2021-03-17HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2021-03-12Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-11SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-04SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/SF0075.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Engross/SF0075.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0075SS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0075HS001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0075H2001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0075H2002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://wyoleg.gov/2021/Amends/SF0075JC001.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/SF0075.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#-272
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#290
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#-683
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#5358
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#460
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#492
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/SF0075#5419

Bill Comments

feedback