WY SF0075 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 117 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; amending provisions related to the crimes of trespassing to unlawfully collect resource data and unlawful collection of resource data; creating the crime of trespassing to access adjacent or proximate land; repealing the definition of "open land"; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal trespass to collect data-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 117 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0055
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0055
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0055
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0055
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 20-10-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-29House3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0
2016-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback