WY SF0074 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; eliminating permitting requirements for the beneficial use of a de minimis amount of water; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Permit not required for using a de minimis amount of water.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-19 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |