WY SF0074 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 81 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mines and minerals; authorizing the state miner's hospital board to hire an additional employee; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State miner's hospital board employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 81 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0044
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0044
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0044
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0044
2016-03-02SenateConcur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2016-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-24 H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-15SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-15 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback