WY SF0073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming lottery; clarifying the calculation and disposition of expenses and proceeds of the lottery; revising terminology; specifying benefits for employees of the lottery; specifying requirements for procurement contracts; specifying use of the fidelity fund; revising requirements related to unclaimed prize money; modifying reporting requirements; making conforming changes; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lottery revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-2-2-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Assigned Chapter Number 33
2019-02-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0010
2019-02-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0010
2019-02-11SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0010
2019-02-11 Assigned Number SEA No. 0010
2019-02-11SenateConcur:Passed 26-2-2-0-0
2019-02-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-11House3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
2019-02-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-07HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-06HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-06HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-3-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback