WY SF0071 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to professions; providing for registration and regulation of appraisal management companies; providing for rules and regulations; providing definitions; providing penalties; providing for criminal history background checks; amending membership of board of real estate appraisers; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisal management company regulation-2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2013-02-04SenateIntroduced and referred to S07; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2013-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-04 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback