WY SF0070 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 67 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 67 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing operation of off-road recreational vehicles as specified; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Off-road recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] |
Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Michael Madden [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Chapter No. 67 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0038 | |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0038 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0038 |
2016-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0038 | |
2016-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2016-02-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-16 | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation 28-2-0-0-0 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |