WY SF0068 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 118 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to administration of government; providing a process for appropriations, expenditure of funds and other measures to address state budget reductions; requiring public reports on the use of the governor's exercise of specified budget powers; providing for contingent appropriations; defining the consensus revenue estimating group; amending public meetings, public records and administrative procedures provisions in relation to the consensus revenue estimating group; providing for revenue diversions for appropriations purposes; specifying contingency of certain revenue streams; specifying application and a conflict of laws provision; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget shortfall measures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 23-7-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 118 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0058
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0058
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0058
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0058
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 23-7-0-0-0
2016-03-02SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 32-27-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2016-02-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-16SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback