WY SF0066 | 2014 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to water development projects; providing for construction of dams and reservoirs; authorizing construction of designated water projects; describing projects; specifying terms and conditions of funding for projects; providing appropriations; modifying project descriptions and terms of appropriations for various specified prior projects; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus water bill-construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-03 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - S05 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S05 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11 Assigned Chapter Number
2014-03-10 Governor Signed SEA0037
2014-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0037
2014-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0037
2014-03-03 Assigned Number SEA0037
2014-03-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-27HousePassed CoW
2014-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-26HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-25HouseRereferred to H02
2014-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2014-02-25HouseRecommended Do Pass
2014-02-21HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2014-02-21HouseReceived for Introduction
2014-02-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2014-02-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2014-02-18SenatePassed CoW
2014-02-18 Amendment Adopted
2014-02-18SenateAmendments Adopted
2014-02-14SenatePlaced on General File
2014-02-14SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2014-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05
2014-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2014-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback