WY SF0066 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; authorizing payment for certain hospice services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance-hospice care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 (H) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (H10) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-29 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2012-02-29 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-27 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-22 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-20 (S) Rereferred to S02
2012-02-20 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-20 (S10) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-14 (S) Introduced and Referred to S10
2012-02-13 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback