WY SF0065 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; establishing a reporting system for governmental waste, fraud and abuse; authorizing enforcement actions; imposing employment consequences; amending provisions governing employee protections related to reporting of government waste, fraud and abuse; requiring posted notice of employee protections as specified; requiring reports; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Government waste, fraud and abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-11 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |