WY SF0065 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state property and buildings; requiring that specified agencies' needs assessments and construction and renovation priorities be submitted by the state building commission to the legislature as specified; requiring legislative approval of capital construction projects as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State building construction-legislative review.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-16 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23SenateDid Not Consider in CoW
2018-02-23SenateCOW
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-16SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 29-0-1-0-0
2018-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-01-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback