WY SF0064 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - COW:Failed 13-43-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to student and school safety and security; modifying duties of the state superintendent of public instruction and school district boards of trustees; amending school safety drill requirements; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety and security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - COW:Failed 13-43-4-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseCOW:Failed 13-43-4-0-0
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-02-11House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2019-01-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-18SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-16SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-11Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-11SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback