WY SF0064 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - (H) Failed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; increasing the fine for failure to use safety belts when required; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Safety belt violations-2.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Bonner [R] | Rep. Kathy Davison [R] | Rep. Mary Hales [D] | Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] |
Sen. John Hastert [D] | Sen. Rick Hunnicutt [R] | Sen. Kit Jennings [R] | Rep. Jack Landon [R] |
Sen. Charles Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | (H) Failed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-16 | (S08) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |