WY SF0063 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 41 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to economic development; amending requirements for setting interest rates on state investments in industrial development bonds; providing a sunset date as specified; amending terms for loans and loan guarantees made from the large project account within the revolving investment fund; authorizing expenditure of funds; providing applicability; repealing an inconsistent provision; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development programs-revisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 41 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0030
2016-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0030
2016-03-01SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0030
2016-03-01 Assigned Number SEA No. 0030
2016-03-01House3rd Reading:Passed 44-15-1-0-0
2016-02-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-26HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-18 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2016-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-05 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback