WY SF0060 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the protection of children; amending when a child may be taken into protective custody as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection of children-child endangerment amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Concur:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-25-4-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 77
2019-02-26 Governor Signed SEA No. 0051
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0051
2019-02-21SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0051
2019-02-21 Assigned Number SEA No. 0051
2019-02-21SenateConcur:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2019-02-21SenateConcur:Bill Reconsideration Motion Passed by Roll Call 21-9-0-0-0
2019-02-20SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-20SenateConcur:Failed 15-13-2-0-0
2019-02-20SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-19House3rd Reading:Passed 31-25-4-0-0
2019-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-08HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-08HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0
2019-01-16Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-15SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-14SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-14SenateS01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback