WY SF0059 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employee retirement plans; eliminating cost-of-living increases for specified plans; providing findings; providing parameters for future benefit increases; requiring information to be provided to employees; providing for a study; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public employee retirement plans benefit increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - H Adopted SF0059JC01 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0059JC01 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0059JC01 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 4 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S02 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-23 | Governor Signed SEA0066 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0066 | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA0066 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Adopted SF0059JC01 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Adopted SF0059JC01 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-07 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-02 | (H02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-28 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-22 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |