WY SF0058 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 102 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 102 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to hospitalization and treatment of mentally ill persons; modifying procedures for involuntary hospitalization; providing for directed outpatient commitment; amending convalescent status; providing for and modifying definitions; providing for access to patient records as specified; amending provisions relating to representation by the state and county of an involuntarily hospitalized or treated person; clarifying provisions relating to payment by the county for involuntary hospitalization and treatment; providing for the coordination of treatment and payment through gatekeepers as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Involuntary hospitalization and treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Chapter No. 102 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-11 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0056 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2016-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0056 | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2016-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 |
2016-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-26 | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-25 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2016-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-25 | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2016-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-17 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-02 | Bill Number Assigned |