WY SF0057 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health and safety; providing a definition for freestanding emergency centers; including freestanding emergency centers in the definition of a health care facility for purposes of licensure as specified; establishing requirements for freestanding emergency centers; providing licensure exceptions for free standing emergency centers as specified; specifying licensure requirements for special districts that operate freestanding emergency centers as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freestanding emergency center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - Adopted SF0057JC001: 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Adopted SF0057JC001: 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor: (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor: (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 99 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-11 Governor Signed SEA No. 0049
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0049
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0049
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0049
2016-03-02HouseAdopted SF0057JC001: 58-0-2-0-0
2016-03-02SenateAdopted SF0057JC001: 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-29HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2016-02-29SenateConcur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0
2016-02-29SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
2016-02-26House3rd Reading
2016-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-23HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-23 H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-17HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2016-02-16HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-10 S10 - Labor:
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback