WY SF0057 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Accountability in Education Act; generally modifying the act and modifying the statewide assessment system and assessments used for statewide accountability; modifying duties and tasks of implementation and administration; authorizing rulemaking and requiring reporting; continuing the select committee on statewide education accountability and advisory committee; providing additional duties and assigning additional areas of accountability system study and development; providing appropriations; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Education accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - H Adopted SF0057JC01 (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0057JC01 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - S Adopted SF0057JC01 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S Did Not Concur (Y: 0 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S04 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-21 | Governor Signed SEA0065 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0065 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0065 | |
2012-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA0065 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Adopted SF0057JC01 | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Adopted SF0057JC01 | |
2012-03-07 | (H) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Appointed JCC01 Members | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Did Not Concur | |
2012-03-07 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-03-01 | (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H04 | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-27 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-21 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-16 | (S04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S04 | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |