WY SF0055 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Assigned Chapter Number 149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to hemp production; requiring fees for compliance inspections and disposal verification; authorizing disposal verification; amending requirements for corrective action plans; requiring rulemaking; correcting references; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp production-fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Adopted SF0055JC001: 42-16-2-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Adopted SF0055JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-2-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24 Assigned Chapter Number 149
2020-03-24 Governor Signed SEA No. 0065
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0065
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0065
2020-03-12 Assigned Number SEA No. 0065
2020-03-10HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-09SenateConcur:Failed 1-29-0-0-0
2020-03-09SenateReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-06House3rd Reading:Passed 40-18-2-0-0
2020-03-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-04House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2020-03-03HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-27HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-27HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2020-02-26HouseS02 - Appropriations:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2020-02-26HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2020-02-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2020-02-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-13Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2020-02-12Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-11SenateCOW:Passed
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on General File
2020-02-11SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-0-2-0-0
2020-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/SF0055.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/SF0055.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/SF0055.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/SF0055.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#106
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#-25
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#221
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#-456
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#-508
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#5479
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#557
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#627
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/SF0055#5573

Bill Comments

feedback