WY SF0052 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Assigned Chapter Number 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; amending the Wyoming Stable Token Act to allow for investments in cash and government securities as specified; authorizing the Wyoming stable token commission to issue different types and amounts of stable tokens and to contract with financial service providers; requiring reporting only for fully reserved stable tokens as specified; providing for a competitive bidding and procurement process; making conforming amendments to criminal history records statutes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Stable Token Act-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-22-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 23-8-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 23-8-0-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assigned Chapter Number 92 | |
2024-03-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0044 | |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0044 |
2024-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0044 | |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-22-0-0-0 |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-03-04 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-22 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 23-8-0-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |