WY SF0051 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; increasing employee contributions for law enforcement officers under the Wyoming Retirement Act; increasing employee contributions under the Wyoming State Highway Patrol, Game and Fish Warden and Criminal Investigator Retirement Act; requiring the increased employee contributions to be paid through a reduction in cash salary of the employee for specified employees; repealing archaic provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming retirement plans-contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 12-18-0-0-0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 28-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |