WY SF0049 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Chapter No. 6 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to insurance; exempting direct primary care agreements from insurance regulation; specifying requirements for exemption; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct primary care-insurance exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-02 Chapter No. 6 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-02 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-02-29 Governor Signed SEA No. 0004
2016-02-25HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0004
2016-02-24SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0004
2016-02-24 Assigned Number SEA No. 0004
2016-02-24House3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-19HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-19 H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-16HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2016-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-12Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-10SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-10 S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 29-0-1-0-0
2016-02-05SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback